HI HB2355 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund costs and other cost adjustments for legislative officers and employees of the Senate, House of Representatives, and various legislative agencies who are excluded from collective bargaining for fiscal biennium 2021-2023. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Making Appropriations For Public Employment Cost Items.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3414) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 213). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 801-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-22 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2022-02-01 | House | Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Auditor
Collective Bargaining
Ethics Commission
Legislative Branch
Legislative Officers and Employees
Legislative Reference Bureau
Legislature
Ombudsman
Public Employment
Raises
Salary Increases
Auditor
Collective Bargaining
Ethics Commission
Legislative Branch
Legislative Officers and Employees
Legislative Reference Bureau
Legislature
Ombudsman
Public Employment
Raises
Salary Increases