HI HB2355 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of mobile electronic devices while operating a motor vehicle. Provides for exceptions. Imposes graduated penalties for violations. (HB2355 HD1)
Title
Mobile Phones; Text Messaging; Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-12. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |