HI HB2355 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a maximum child care subsidy of $ per month per child and authorizes the department of human services to amend its criteria for determining eligibility for child care subsidies, with certain exceptions. Appropriates funds for HMS305. Effective January 1, 2050. (HB2355 HD1)
Title
Child Care; Subsidy; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Bertram [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Shimabukuro, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Nishimoto. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-08-10 9:30 AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-08-10. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-01-10 10:45 AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-01-10. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 01-28-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |