HI HB2354 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires individuals, entities, and insurers to cooperate with insurance fraud investigations. Bars restitution for failure to cooperate. Effective July 1, 2010. (SD1)
Title
Insurance Fraud; Cooperation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2781) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Sakamoto. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-10 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 107). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Herkes, Morita. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-23-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 92-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Luke, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Ito, Karamatsu, McKelvey, Marumoto. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-01-10 2:00 pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |