HI HB2350 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes limited benefit health insurance from accident and health or sickness insurance provisions enacted after July 1, 2010, unless the provisions expressly state that they apply. (HB2350 HD1)
Title
Limited Benefit Health Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Michael Magaoay [D] |
Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 230-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-29-10 9:30 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2371 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - (H) Act 115, on 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 329).