HI HB2349 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the application deadline for financial assistance for higher education available to foster or former foster youth, clarifies that financial assistance is for related higher education costs, and clarifies eligibility and program requirements of the Young Adult Voluntary Foster Care Program.
Title
Youth Transitioning From Foster Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-18 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2878 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Act 134, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2349&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2349_.HTM |