HI HB2313 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of tobacco products and e-cigarettes on Hawaii Health Systems Corporation health facilities. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB2313 HD1)
Title
Tobacco; E-cigarettes; Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Premises; Prohibited Use
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4). |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 358-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Woodson. |
2014-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2863 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM.