HI HB2295 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of the Attorney General to have law enforcement vehicles, with colored lights, that are recognized authorized emergency vehicles.
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2851 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2295&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2295_.HTM |