HI HB2277 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:40PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:40PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Health Care Transformation within the State Health Planning and Development Agency, and changes the agency's name to the Hawaii Health Care Planning and Policy Authority. Establishes the Health Care Transformation Special Fund. Extends from July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2050, the Health Care Transformation Program, which is temporarily placed within the Office of the Governor, and effective July 1, 2050, transfers the Health Care Transformation Program to the Hawaii Health Care Planning and Policy Authority. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Health Care Transformation; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:40PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:40PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 9:10AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 5:10PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-14 9:10AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Luke Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3381) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-14 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2910) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-14 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 179). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Har, C. Lee, Thielen, Woodson excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 759-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14 at 8:30AM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 01-31-14 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-14 at 11:00am. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 01-29-14 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2827 (Same As) 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Jordan, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).