HI HB2264 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:30PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:30PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the High Technology Development Corporation for the provision of technology internship grants and development of programs to support the local talent pipeline for the technology industry. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
High Technology Development Corporation; Internship Grants; Local Workforce Development; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:30PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 2:15PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Keith-Agaran, Galuteria Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Kong, Tokioka, Ward. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 588) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3482) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3118) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 36). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 45-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3011 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 26