HI HB2263 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL/EEP/HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL/EEP/HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Facilitates the jurisdiction transfer of water quality management, water pollution, wastewater treatment, instream flow standards, and applications for water quality from the Department of Health to the Commission on Water Resource Management.
Title
Relating To Water Quality Management.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP/HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2606 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to WTL/HTH, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Cesspools
Commission on Water Resource Management
Department of Health
Instream Flow Standards
Jurisdiction
Wastewater Treatment
Water Pollution
Water Quality Management
Commission on Water Resource Management
Department of Health
Instream Flow Standards
Jurisdiction
Wastewater Treatment
Water Pollution
Water Quality Management
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2263&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2263_.HTM |