HI HB2261 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for more flexible use of the State's One Call Center funding collected from civil penalties by amending section 269E6(e), Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
One Call Center; Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14. |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 2:45PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2810 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28