HI HB2247 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires proof of compliance with ignition interlock laws to be eligible for a driver's license following the license revocation period. Amends the driver's license revocation period for first time offenders convicted of operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant and people who do not own or have a vehicle or are unable to drive. Allows early termination of driver's license revocation. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Operating A Vehicle Under The Influence Of An Intoxicant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 791-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3165 (Same As) 2022-06-17 - Act 094, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1194).
Subjects
Driver's License Revocation
Ignition Interlock Device
Operating a Vehicle Under the Influence of an Intoxicant
Ignition Interlock Device
Operating a Vehicle Under the Influence of an Intoxicant