HI HB2239 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health to provide public health statistics records to law enforcement officers to facilitate criminal investigations.
Title
Public Health Statistics Records; Disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 332-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-07-14 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2788 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - Referred to PSM/HTH, JDL.