HI HB2238 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reclassifies certain non-general funds of the Department of Accounting and General Services, pursuant to the recommendations made by the Auditor in Auditor's Report No. 23-17. Takes effect 7/1/2491. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Non-general Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3268) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-19-24 3:00PM; CR 225. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 323). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ichiyama, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson excused (5). |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |