HI HB2226 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a cap for an eligible taxpayer and the taxpayer's related entities per taxable year for the tax credit for research activities. Consolidates the survey and certification requirements. Amends the annual aggregate cap. Requires certification on a first-come, first-served basis to be based on the date a complete application is received, subject to certain conditions, for the tax credit. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Tax Credit For Research Activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 357-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2599 (Same As) 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).