HI HB2216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-21 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires at least 5 Hawaiian Homes Commission members to be Native Hawaiian or current Hawaiian homestead lessees; and at least 2 of those 5 to be on the waitlist for Hawaiian home lands. Authorizes commission members to elect a chairperson and vice chairperson. Creates the position of Director of Hawaiian Home Lands and separates the Director's responsibilities from those of the Chairperson of the Commission. Effective July 1, 2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Say, Yamane. |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-13-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-12-20 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 109-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-31-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |