HI HB2215 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Act 047, 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Act 047, 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the driver of a vehicle passing and overtaking a bicycle proceeding in the same direction to allow at least three feet of separation between the right side of the driver's vehicle and the left side of the bicyclist. (HB2215 CD1)
Title
Relating To Bicycles.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Act 047, 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2018-06-20 | House | Act 047, on 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 81-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 81-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi, Shimabukuro, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Nishimoto, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 5:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Taniguchi, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; K. Rhoads. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 688) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3593) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3136) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 320). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 359-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |