HI HB2213 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of planning to review and propose updates to the state planning act. Appropriates moneys. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
2020-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-11HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 312.
2020-01-29HouseRe-referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 8
2020-01-29HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 309.
2020-01-28HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 309.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-21HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback