HI HB2195 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals requirement that the University of Hawaii prepare an annual report regarding the Construction Academy. (HB2195 HD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Community Colleges; Construction Academy Annual Report; Repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 142-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-02-16 2:01PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2971 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 329.