HI HB2184 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates deadlines for the director of finance to establish accessible searchable websites and implement pilot program on data collection and subawards reporting.
Title
State Funds; State Awards; Subawards Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-29-12 4:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-28-12 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-28-12 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-14-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2184 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2184_.HTM |