HI HB2174 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Re-Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Re-Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "highly intoxicated driver". Provides the evidentiary standard for establishing that a person was a "highly intoxicated driver". Requires that ignition interlock devices be installed and maintained on one or more vehicles registered to and all vehicles operated by anyone convicted of operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant, during the applicable period of license revocation. Increases the license revocation period ordered by the Administrative Driver's License Revocation Office and extends the applicable lookback periods from five to ten years. Establishes higher penalties for a highly intoxicated driver operating a vehicle. Establishes higher penalties for offenses of operating a vehicle under the influence of an intoxicant. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Operating A Vehicle Under The Influence Of An Intoxicant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 182). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) McKelvey, Perruso, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson. |
2020-02-03 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-30 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 01-31-20 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 01-31-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2330 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.