HI HB2171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of taxation to provide the administrator of each county's real property assessment division with an image of all certificates of conveyances filed with the bureau of conveyances. (SD1)
Title
Taxation; Conveyance Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Reported from WTL/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2762) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Bunda, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Fukunaga, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-10 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WTL/TIA, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 184). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-10 1:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and M. Lee, McKelvey excused (2). | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 127-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Cabanilla, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, C. Lee, Luke, Morita, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Sagum. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 02-01-10 9:30am in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2610 (Same As) 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 676).