HI HB2165 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes leases for commercial, industrial, and hotel or resort purposes eligible for disposition by negotiation pursuant to section 171-59(b), Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Disposition Of Public Lands By Negotiation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3133 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2165&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2165_.HTM |