HI HB2163 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to LBR, WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to LBR, WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all employees hired prior to July 1, 1998, and who have not designated a financial account into which the State is authorized to deposit the employee's pay, to designate an account no later than a date to be determined.
Title
State Employees; Salary and Pension Payments; Direct Deposit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 87). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-22-10 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 44-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Souki, Pine. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 1/29/10 9:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |