HI HB2147 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act 141, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act 141, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the airport and stadium authority operation of concessions for electronic communication services and solely for advertising from the public concession bidding process. Repeals June 30, 2021. (HB2147 CD1)
Title
Contracts for Concessions; Public Concessions; Airports; Stadium Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act 141, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244). |
2014-06-26 | House | Act 141, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1244). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 94-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 94-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ige, Kidani, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:45PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 2:45PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 3:30PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-22-14 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Takayama, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani, Wakai, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3407) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2850) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 88). |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Ito, Oshiro. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14. |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 2:45PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-29-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2751 (Same As) 2014-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 29