HI HB2133 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 657).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 657).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Procurement Office to authorize reseller agreements in multi-state contracting agreements and to place orders directly with local resellers designated by original equipment manufacturers; defines "local reseller." (HB2133 CD1)
Title
Procurement; Reseller Agreements
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Michael Magaoay [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 657). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 419). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ching excused (1). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 144-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 144-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Taniguchi, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 2:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-19-10 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-15-10 9:30AM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-13-10 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 473). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Choy Co-Chairs; Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Taniguchi, Co-Chair(s); Ige, Takamine. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) One Day Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2994) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 03-30-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2801) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 03-17-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-10 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to EDT, JGO. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 85). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Sagum. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-18-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3). | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Takai, Tsuji, Wakai, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Berg; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Manahan, Tokioka. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-11-10 11:20AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-11-10. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making by EBM on Tuesday, 02-09-10 8:30 am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-09-10. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 02-04-10 8:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |