HI HB2124 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits certain former State employees from representing certain interests in a legislative or administrative action before the State for twelve months after the termination of their employment. Effective 1/1/2021. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Code Of Ethics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
2020-08-31HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
2020-07-10HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-07-10SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425).
2020-07-10HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2020-07-10HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-07-08SenateReceived notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421).
2020-07-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 590) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-07-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-07-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
2020-07-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3759) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-06-30SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016.
2020-05-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-05-15SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3501) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-05SenateRe-Referred to GVO, JDC.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 177).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 922-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Yamane.
2020-02-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-25HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2020-02-12HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 360-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-02-06HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, Matsumoto.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback