HI HB2122 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DLNR to establish a standardized fee schedule for the administration of its comprehensive historic preservation program. Exempts the establishment of fees from the rulemaking process. (HB2122 HD1)
Title
DLNR; SHPD; Historic Preservation; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-14-14 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-11 | House | HD 1 adopted and recommitted to OMH for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Tokioka excused. |
2014-02-11 | House | Recommends recommittal to OMH. |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 348-14) as amended in HD 1. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-14 11:05AM in conference room 325. |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to OMH, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |