HI HB210 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of the Prosecuting Attorney of the City and County of Honolulu for the Career Criminal Prosecution Unit and Victim Witness Assistance Program. (HB210 HD1)
Title
Honolulu Prosecuting Attorney Package; Grants-in-Aid; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 814) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 258), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Thielen. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-15 at 2:00 pm in room 325. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-06-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB423 (Same As) 2015-06-05 - Act 082, 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).