HI HB2092 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarettes Program Special Fund, and authorizes the establishment of staff positions for the State Fire Council to accomplish its duties and responsibilities. Effective July 1, 2020. (SD1)
Title
State Fire Council; Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarettes
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-19 | (S) Reported from CPN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2784) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Sakamoto, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-10 1:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to CPN/PSM, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 83). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:35PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-22-10. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-19-10 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-04-10 8:30 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |