HI HB2087 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two-year elder access pilot program in the Executive Office on Aging, to improve access to essential services and reduce wait times for seniors seeking public services through state and county government offices. Authorizes the Executive Office on Aging to enter into memorandums of agreement with the counties and other state agencies to implement the pilot program. Requires the Auditor to evaluate the pilot program. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Executive Office On Aging.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 77-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Nishimoto. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2852 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to HHS, WAM.