HI HB2087 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends current sunset date of the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit from January 1, 2026, to January 1, 2032.
Title
Relating To The Motion Picture, Digital Media, And Film Production Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3055 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2087&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2087_.HTM |