HI HB2085 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a landlord or the landlord's agent from charging an application fee for a criminal background check or credit report if an applicant provides a certified copy of a criminal background check or credit report. Requires a landlord or the landlord's agent to provide, upon request, a certified copy of an applicant's criminal background check or credit report.
Title
Relating To The Residential Landlord-tenant Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-24. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2127 (Same As) 2024-03-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2085&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2085_.HTM |