HI HB2084 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor to conduct an audit of Hawaii Public Housing Authority's management of Punchbowl Homes. Requires the Auditor to submit its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the Regular Session of 2013. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Management Audit of Punchbowl Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (H) The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 01-25-12 9:20AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to HSG, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2084 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2084_.HTM |