HI HB2080 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes fuel cell electric vehicles in the definition of electric vehicles for purposes of parking exemptions, HOV lane use, registration, and required parking spaces in places of public accommodation. Grants procurement priority for fuel cell electric vehicles for state and county vehicle purchases. (HB2080 HD2)
Title
Electric Vehicles; Fuel Cell Electric Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 251). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 558-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-16-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3). |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. |
2016-02-03 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-03-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |