HI HB2059 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for flood mitigation measures at Makaha Valley and Lualualei, based on structural and nonstructural measures recommended in studies previously conducted.
Title
Relating To Flood Mitigation.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-17-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3188 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2059&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2059_.HTM |