HI HB2029 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Human Services and Department of Health to appoint an existing employee to apply for and manage grants, request grant writing assistance from other state agencies, or contract or employ a dedicated capture manager for this purpose. Requires reports to the Legislature. Sunsets on 6/30/2024.
Title
Relating To Grants.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3327 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2029&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2029_.HTM |