HI HB2021 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fine for conviction of certain offenses when an unmanned aerial system is used to commit the offense. Provides that the offense of simple trespass can be committed when a person knowingly enters or remains unlawfully in the airspace directly above premises up to 400 feet above ground level. (HB2021 HD1)
Title
Unmanned Aerial Systems; Simple Trespass; Penal Code; Fines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |