HI HB2015 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program within the Aina Mauna legacy program of DHHL to remove and harvest gorse from Mauna Kea and develop it as a marketable product to expand economic opportunities for native Hawaiians. Requires reports to the legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3654) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-12-20 1:17PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HWN/AEN, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 161). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-31 | House | Re-referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |