HI HB2007 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for the department of transportation when a person voluntarily purchases a verified carbon offset for carbon dioxide emissions resulting from their air travel to or from an airport in the State.
Title
Relating To Carbon Offsets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2632 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Re-Referred to TRS/AEN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2007&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2007_.HTM |