HI HB2001 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Commission on Criminal Justice and Sentencing Reform in the Governor's Office. Requires the Commission to develop a statewide framework of sentencing and corrections policies to further reduce the State's incarcerated population by an unspecified percentage by an unspecified year. The Commission shall also develop a plan to reduce spending on corrections and reinvest in strategies to increase public safety and reduce recidivism. (HB2001 HD1)
Title
Public Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-04 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-04-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |