HI HB200 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB200
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 1/1/2024, requires rental kayaks to be registered and numbered with the department of land and natural resources and have the identification number affixed to the rental kayak. Requires the department to establish fees for registration and registration renewal of rental kayaks. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Vessels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 138) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-01-31 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB200 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB1028 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1028 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=200&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB200_HD1_.HTM |