HI HB200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 088, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act 088, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the operating and capital improvement budget of the Executive Branch for fiscal years 2021-2022 and 2022-2023. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The State Budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Act 088, on 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190). |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Act 088, 06/24/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190). |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1168), various appropriations throughout the bill. |
2021-06-24 | House | Vetoed on 06-23-21 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168), line-item appropriations veto. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/21/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-04-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 633). |
2021-04-27 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 857). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 180). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 180) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, Marten, McDermott. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-19-21 2:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 554). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella. |
2021-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Branco, Cullen, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 624) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-21. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1553) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-21 2:15PM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-21 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 9:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 317). |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1229 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WAM.