HI HB1994 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to DOA to research and develop methods for the prevention and treatment of macadamia felted coccid. Effective 7/1/2016.
Title
Macadamia Nut Trees; Macadamia Felted Coccid; Agriculture; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1994&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1994_.HTM |