HI HB1994 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to ENE/AGL/TIA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to ENE/AGL/TIA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an affirmative responsibility on the consignor of any landscape material or products, agricultural goods, construction materials, equipment, vehicles, soil, or sand to prevent the movement of invasive species in Hawaii. Appropriates funds to the department of agriculture to enforce restrictions on intrastate movement of invasive species. Establishes and appropriates funds for an invasive species task force to address the continued movement of invasive plants, plant pests, and vertebrate pests between islands. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB1994 HD1)
Title
Invasive Species; Civil Liability; Intrastate Transport; Task Force; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to ENE/AGL/TIA, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 284). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Awana, Cullen, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Ito, Jordan, Lowen, McKelvey, Onishi, Oshiro, Say, Takayama, Tsuji, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Jordan, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-13 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say excused (1). |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-01-27 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 01-27-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |