HI HB1988 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of taxation to coordinate an outreach initiative to increase awareness and use of the federal earned income tax credit. Makes an appropriation. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1988 HD1)
Title
Office of Hawaiian Affairs Package; Earned Income Tax Credit Outreach Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Yamane, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Wooley, Ching. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2179 (Same As) 2012-03-20 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5).