HI HB1983 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Keith-Agaran voting no (1) and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Keith-Agaran voting no (1) and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the department of public safety to release a committed person serving a misdemeanor sentence if the person has served at least two-thirds of the sentence imposed by the court.
Title
Misdemeanor Offenses; Early Release
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Keith-Agaran voting no (1) and Representative(s) Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3). | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, M. Lee, Souki, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Pine. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-11-10 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |