HI HB1982 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 255, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1364).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Big Island Dairy LLC with the operation of its dairy farm in Ookala. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Agriculture; Big Island Dairy LLC ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-13HouseAct 255, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1364).
2016-07-13SenateAct 255, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1364).
2016-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2016-05-05SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684).
2016-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2016-05-03HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2016-05-03SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676).
2016-04-29HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16.
2016-04-26SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628).
2016-04-25HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2016-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2016-04-18HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Evans, Mizuno, Matsumoto.
2016-04-15SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2016-04-14HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2016-04-12HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-04-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
2016-04-08SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-16.
2016-04-08SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3568) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2016-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
2016-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
2016-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2016-03-23SenateReported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3003) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2016-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom.
2016-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to WLA, WAM.
2016-03-04SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-03-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 22).
2016-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2016-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
2016-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2016-02-09HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
2016-02-09HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2016-02-04HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2016-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2016-01-27HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
2016-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2016-01-22HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback