HI HB1981 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-27 - (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-27 - (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds 2 new members of the board of directors of the PLDC. Requires that the Hawaii public land optimization plan provide for the protection of cultural practices. Requires the PLDC to comply with certain provisions of law relating to the alienation of land and the OHA's pro rata portion of the public land trust.
Title
PLDC; Cultural Practics; Public Land Trust; Office of Hawaiian Affairs Package
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 01-27-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to WLO, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2172 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - (S) Referred to HWN/WLH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1981 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1981_.HTM |